This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/12/2021 at 04:32:14 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. Marie Nicholson

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marie Nicholson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8979

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

7000 Target Parwkay N

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

Defendant

Nicholson, Marie

Watauga, TX 76148-1432

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandi Marie Addison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Option Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Nicholson, Marie: Returned Unserved 08/17/2021; Returned: 08/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-03535: TD Bank USA, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi Marie Addison