This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/08/2021 at 22:34:43 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. vs. ANGELINA ARROYO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELINA ARROYO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3274

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

ARROYO, ANGELINA

Burleson, TX 76028-6900

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: SETTING LTR FOR 9/27 TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: ANGELINACARDONASTUDIO@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCITATION: ARROYO, ANGELINA: Served: 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-05338: TD BANK USA, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD BANK USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery