This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/28/2021 at 13:33:24 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. AMANDA J. HUNTER AKA AMANDA J HUNTER

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMANDA J HUNTER AKA AMANDA J HUNTER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5739

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

AMANDA J. HUNTER AKA AMANDA J HUNTER

Fort Worth, TX 76179-7584

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler G. Lansden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 02/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 10/30/2021 VIA ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION: AMANDA J. HUNTER AKA AMANDA J HUNTER: Served: 10/30/2021; Returned: 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-5589: TD Bank USA, N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: JAVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler G Lansden