Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/21/2018 at 22:40:37 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs. RUBEN MENDOZA AKA RUBEN G. MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 TD BANK USA, N A AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUBEN MENDOZA AKA RUBEN G MENDOZA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4634

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

275 W. Campbell Rd Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

RUBEN MENDOZA AKA RUBEN G. MENDOZA

Arlington, TX 76013-6161

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Melamed

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W WESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,697.04; Awarded To: TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Awarded Against: RUBEN MENDOZA AKA RUBEN G. MENDOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Letter Issued: CANCELLING BENCH TRIAL ON 08/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Rule 11 Agreement Pending/Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted; 01/22/2018; Reset by Court to 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Agreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Order Granting Motion for Leave/Request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Motion for Leave/Permission for Discovery Filed: DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Notice of Appearance Filed: BY DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • CITATION: RUBEN MENDOZA AKA RUBEN G. MENDOZA: Served: 08/23/2017; Returned: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2017-02985: EXECUTIVE PROCESS LLC: (41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTON , MICHAEL W