This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/09/2019 at 10:26:50 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs. LORINDA L ADAMS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 TD BANK USA, N A AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORINDA L ADAMS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7875

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES, INC.

7000 Target Parkway North Mail Stop Ned

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

7000 Target Parkway North Mail Stop Ned

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

Defendants

ADAMS, LORINDA L.

Fort Worth, TX 76244-6136

ADAMS, LORINDA L

Fort Worth, TX 76244-6136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Stuart Peterson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Comments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF ATTNY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT A MOTION FOR DEFAULT. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): ABC LEGAL. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Letter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Answer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Citation Returned: DEFN SERVED BY ABC LEGAL BY POSTING TO FRONT DOOR ON 12/8/18 AT 7:28 PM AND MAILING COPY TO DEFN ON 12/10/18 AT 11:42 AM. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Comments: KELLY FAULKNER FROM ABC PICKED UP PAPERWORK ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. READY FOR PICKUP. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Comments: PAPERWORK PICKED UP BY KELLY WITH ABC LEGAL/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • CITATION: ADAMS, LORINDA L: Served: 12/10/2018; Returned: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Comments: CITATION ISSUED FOR PICKUP.MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): JAVITCH BLOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2018-04481: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less