This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/28/2021 at 13:31:00 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank vs. Jessie Hampton Wilson

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 TD Bank USA, N A As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jessie Hampton Wilson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5737

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank Usa, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Wilson, Jessie Hampton

Fort Worth, TX 76131-1109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Nicole Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 02/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: BAD ADDRESS LTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketBad Address Notification Mailed to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Wilson, Jessie Hampton: Returned Unserved 10/20/2021; Returned: 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-5587: TD Bank Usa, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: JAVITCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyla Baxter