Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/16/2018 at 08:25:50 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank vs Jamie Perry

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 TD Bank USA, N A As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jamie Perry. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********82-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD Bank USA, N.A.

7000 Target Parkway North Mail Stop Ncd

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

C/o Target Corp Services, Inc.

7000 Target Parkway North Mail Stop Ncd

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank

7000 Target Parkway North Mail Stop Ncd

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

Defendant

Perry, Jamie

Azle, TX 76020-5034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Melamed

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Judgment - Default Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#9: Alias Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Citation: placed in EZ Messenger basket 2-21-18; Perry, Jamie: Served: 03/13/2018; Returned: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#8:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Order for Rule 106 Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Citation: EZ Messenger; Perry, Jamie: Returned Unserved 01/25/2018; Returned: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-130477: TD Bank USA, N.A.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-128762: TD Bank USA, N.A.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 262.00; Total Payments and Credits: 262.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O TARGET CORP SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where as successor in interest to Target National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melamed, Marc A