This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/14/2017 at 07:13:18 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs. DIANE L SEARCEY,MONTY D SEARCEY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIANE L SEARCEY,MONTY D SEARCEY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2727

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

SEARCEY, DIANE L

SEARCEY, MONTY D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jared David Chilek

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $6,040.20; Awarded To: TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Awarded Against: DIANE SEARCEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketOrder Granting Appointment of Receiver Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSpecial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: FOR PLTF $6040.20 PLUS CC AND INT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TRCP 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only: FOR MONTY D SEARCEY ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: FOR MONTY SEARCEY ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FOR DIANE L SEARCEY $80

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCITATION: EZ; SEARCEY, DIANE L: Served: 08/05/2015; Returned: 08/13/2015; SEARCEY, MONTY D: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2015-04749: RSIEH LLC: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared David Chilek