This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/25/2022 at 05:08:23 (UTC).

TD Bank, N.A. vs Joel Arredondo

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 TD Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joel Arredondo. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********91-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank, N.A.

2035 Limestone Road

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendants

Arredondo, Joel

Texas, TX 76134-1035

at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mirza Kamal Baig

Defendant Attorney

Michael W Weston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5: Defendant Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service - Joel Arredondo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184343: TD Bank, N.A.: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC LEGAL; Arredondo, Joel: Served: 08/13/2022; Returned: 08/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baig, Mirza Kamal