Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/26/2017 at 10:30:43 (UTC).

TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS vs. SOSIUA MONTUMANU,TIANA MONTUMANU AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SOSIUA MONTUMANU,TIANA MONTUMANU AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8294

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Defendants

MONTUMANU, TIANA

Euless, TX 76039

MONTUMANU, SOSIUA

Euless, TX 76039

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $1,023.22; Awarded To: TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS; Awarded Against: SOSIUA MONTUMANU, et al; Comment: RET OF PREM + $1,023.22 BR + CC @ 5% INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Writ of Possession Signed and Returned to Constable: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED; SENT TO C03 FOR SRVC ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: MONTUMANU, SOSIUA: Unserved ; MONTUMANU, TIANA: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable: WOP TO BE EXECUTED AT 1610 LAKESHORE DR #124, EULESS, TX 76039; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Writ of Possession Requested: IN PERSON BY PLTF; FEES PAID IN FULL; PLTF'S PHONE NO. 817-877-3566 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Bond for Appeal Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFNS WITH JGNT ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: PRO SE PLTF APPEARED; DEFNS DID NOT; DEFAULT JGNT FOR PLTF FOR RET OF PREM + $1,023.22 BR + CC @ 5% INT; MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED ON 8/02/17 @ 3:42 PM "BY SERVING NEPHEW' IN PERSON FOR TIANA MONTUMANU AT 1610 LAKESHORE DR #124 EULESS, TX 76039 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED ON 8/02/17 @ 3:42 PM "BY SERVING NEPHEW IN PERSON" FOR SOSIUA MONTUMANU AT 16101 LAKESHORE DR #124, EULESS, TX 76039 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • EVICTION: MONTUMANU, SOSIUA: Served: 08/02/2017; Returned: 08/03/2017; MONTUMANU, TIANA: Served: 08/02/2017; Returned: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Citation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-03661: TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-03315: HOUSING CHANNEL--RENTAL: (191.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TARRANT COUNTY HOUSING ASPEN OAKS; Total Financial Assessment: 346.00; Total Payments and Credits: 346.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 191.00

    Read MoreRead Less