This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/24/2022 at 04:39:15 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Yolanda Wiggins

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yolanda Wiggins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0802

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

Wiggins, Yolanda

N Richlnd Hls, TX 76180-8352

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Motion to Retain Granted: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEmailed: COPY TO PLTF ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted: order to retain// EFILED// 30 DAYS/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: Motion to retain// EFILED// 1ST REQ. BY PLTF'S ATTY (5.13.22 DWOP)// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: SET FOR 05/13/22 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO PLTF//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketLetter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00393: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN TO PPS// RE-EMLD W/ CORRECT CASE # ON SUBJECT LINE// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION: CTN ISSUED TO ABC LEGAL// NO; Wiggins, Yolanda: Served: 01/29/2022; Returned: 01/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang