This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/17/2023 at 15:03:29 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Tony Coward

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tony Coward. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8296

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Coward, Tony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Coward, Tony: Served: 03/23/2023; Returned: 03/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-01971: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less