This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/15/2019 at 00:16:09 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Russell Godwin

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Russell Godwin. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayes, Matt and Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9913

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Hayes, Matt

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

Godwin, Russell

Kennedale, TX 76060

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandi Marie Addison

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W WESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $1,006.41; Awarded To: Synchrony Bank; Awarded Against: Russell Godwin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:45 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $1006.41 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: TO ALLOW TIME TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice of Settlement Filed: FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: SET FOR TRIAL 90 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Agreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Notice of Appearance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • CITATION: ABC; Godwin, Russell: Served: 10/04/2018; Returned: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07474: Synchrony Bank: (49.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 49.50; Total Payments and Credits: 49.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 49.50

    Read MoreRead Less