This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/14/2022 at 04:34:36 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Robert Holcomb

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robert Holcomb. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0803

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

Holcomb, Robert

Ft Worth, TX 76177-7401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 06/08/2022 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: VIA MAIL// BY DEFN PRO SE// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: DEFN'S EML AND PHONE # PER DEFN CONTACTED CT// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: REGARDING ANSWER TO BE FILED WITH THE CT// DEFN WILL MAIL TO CT// LCERK OPTIONS TO EFILE/ ADOBE AND EMAIL AS WELL// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00394: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMLD CTN TO ABC// NO; Holcomb, Robert: Served: 01/22/2022; Returned: 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang