This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/14/2021 at 19:31:58 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Jennifr Finley

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifr Finley. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5346

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Finley, Jennifr

Fort Worth, TX 76116-9018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-04790: Synchrony Bank: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Finley, Jennifr: Served: 07/08/2021: Response Received: 07/28/2021; Returned: 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan