This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/19/2022 at 04:38:48 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Jennifer Ramirez

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Ramirez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0736

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road, Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendants

Ramirez, Jennifer

Hurst, TX 76053-4856

Apt B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : DFLT JM DOCS DUE OR CT WILL DISMISS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: PLTF ATTY APRD//DEFN FAILED TO APR//PLTF TO SUBMIT DFLT JM DOCSTO CT BY 05.10.22 @2PM FOR DFLT JM TO BE GRANTED OR CT WILL DISMISS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: WANTED TO RESCHEDULE THE PTM/CLERK INFORMED ALL REQUEST MUST BE IN WRITING/MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 5/3/2022 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: CONTAINED IN ANSWER//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: IN PERSON / HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Ramirez, Jennifer: Served: 01/19/2022; Returned: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00250: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APT B is a litigant

Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang