Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 04:00:43 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Don Harper

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Don Harper. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8057

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

Harper, Don

Fort Worth, TX 76112-2006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Chase Lincer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Harper, Don: Served: 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01979: Synchrony Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lincer, Joseph Chase