This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:42:26 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. David Doan

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Doan. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0739

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

170 Election Road Suite 125

Draper, UT 84020

Defendant

Doan, David

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Defendant Attorney

Michael W Weston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Mediation; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: GRANT 30 DAYS//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketAgreed Motion for Continuance Filed: EFILED BY DEFN ATTY//SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES//PTM 06.08.22//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY/FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 06/08/2022 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendants Original Answer/EFILED/ DEFN ATTY/ WITH NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: REP FROM WESTON LEGAL//WANTING TO KNOW THE AMT LISTED ON PETN//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Doan, David: Returned Unserved 04/27/2022; Returned: 04/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00253: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/ EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com /HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery