This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/26/2022 at 10:36:21 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. David Cochran

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Cochran. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7764

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Cochran, David

Fort Worth, TX 76244-5892

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDWOP Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit Filed: AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY. DWOP SET FOR 07/08/22 AT 10:00AM IN HURST. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketComments: 90 DAYS WITH NO ACTIVITY. CASE TO BE SET FOR DWOP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 1/19/22 @ 11:48AM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Cochran, David: Served: 01/19/2022; Returned: 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-00211: Synchrony Bank: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): RAUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery