Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:40:25 (UTC).

Surface Works, Inc. d/b/a Surface Connection vs Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Surface Works, Inc d/b/a Surface Connection filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********00-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

d/b/a Surface Connection

Surface Works, Inc.

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

d/b/a CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

b/s its Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Emailed to attys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Index # 7: to Dissolve writ of garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Court held a hearing via Zoom on Def. Motion for New Trial and to Dissolve Wrti of Garnishment. All parties appeared and made arguments. Court granted New trial and therefore garnishment will be dissolved because there is no valid judgment. Court to sign orders.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 6: re: Defendant's Exhibit 1 for April 6th Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMotion: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rymell, Jennifer) : TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 5: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMotion: to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service - Original Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 3: Certificate of Service-Notice To Judgment Debtor WKK Shreveport LLC d/b/a The Jolie Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170579: Surface Works, Inc.: (257.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Surface Works, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 257.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice: hold for atty pick up; WKK Shreveport, LLC: Served: 03/18/2021; Returned: 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for atty pick up; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Surface Works, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where d/b/a CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein