This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/12/2023 at 22:32:13 (UTC).

SUMMIT RIDGE TX PARTNERS, LLC, DBA CORTLAND CHISHOLM TRAIL vs. AMANDA DURST AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 SUMMIT RIDGE TX PARTNERS, LLC, DBA CORTLAND CHISHOLM TRAIL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMANDA DURST AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4541

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMIT RIDGE TX PARTNERS, LLC, DBA CORTLAND CHISHOLM TRAIL

6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

DURST, AMANDA

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Summary Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2022-07961: NATIONWIDE COMPLIANT: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDefn Did Not Pay Rent into Court Registry for Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: DURST, AMANDA: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Given to Defn of Rent to be Paid on Eviction Appeal: 1965.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $4,944.19; Awarded To: SUMMIT RIDGE TX PARTNERS, LLC, DBA CORTLAND CHISHOLM TRAIL; Awarded Against: AMANDA DURST; Comment: COPY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMailed default: NOTICE TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (11:00 AM) () : Result: Judgment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2022-06898: NATIONWIDE COMPLIANT: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff SUMMIT RIDGE TX PARTNERS, LLC, DBA CORTLAND CHISHOLM TRAIL; Total Financial Assessment: 284.00; Total Payments and Credits: 284.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 129.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEVICTION: 120722 CITN RETD/EXECUTED 120122/BY SERVING DEFT/SET FOR TRIAL (121622 @ 11:00 AM); DURST, AMANDA: Served: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Summit Ridge TX Partners, LLC, dba Cortland Chisholm Trail is a litigant