Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:14 (UTC).

Stens Specialty Brands LLC d/b/a Stens vs Morrison Outdoor Power Equipment, LLC, Brian Jay Morrison, Charles Armstrong Morrison, Rachel Leann Morrison, jointly and severally

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Stens Specialty Brands LLC d/b/a Stens filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Morrison Outdoor Power Equipment, LLC, Brian Jay Morrison, Charles Armstrong Morrison, Rachel Leann Morrison, jointly and severally. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********02-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stens Specialty Brands LLC d/b/a Stens

655 W. Ryan Street

Brillion, WI 54110

Defendants

Morrison Outdoor Power Equipment, LLC

8300 County Road 508

Alvarado, TX 76609

Morrison, Charles Armstrong

Alvarado, TX 76009

c/o Brian Jay Morrison, managing member

Alvarado, TX 76609

jointly and severally

Alvarado, TX 76009

Morrison, Rachel Leann

Alvarado, TX 76009

Morrison, Brian Jay

Alvarado, TX 76009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Heath Coffman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Citation: call Vickie for pick-up: 817-339-2430; Morrison Outdoor Power Equipment, LLC: Served: 02/27/2017; Returned: 03/03/2017; Morrison, Brian Jay: Served: 02/27/2017; Returned: 03/03/2017; Morrison, Charles Armstrong: Served: 02/20/2017; Returned: 02/22/2017; Morrison, Rachel Leann: Served: 02/20/2017; Returned: 02/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: with discovery requests

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119155: Stens Specialty Brands LLC d/b/a Stens: (265.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Stens Specialty Brands LLC d/b/a Stens; Total Financial Assessment: 265.00; Total Payments and Credits: 265.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 265.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Heath Coffman