This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/29/2021 at 19:34:38 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company aso Rockford Willett vs. Adam Mitchell

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company aso Rockford Willett filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Adam Mitchell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5235

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company aso Rockford Willett

2500 Dallas Parkway, Suite 495

Plano, TX 75093

Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C.

2500 Dallas Parkway, Suite 495

Plano, TX 75093

Defendant

Mitchell, Adam

Joshua, TX 76058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew D. Warner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice: Return of Service Adam Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CITN/PETN TO NECKHART@CSTRIALLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Mitchell, Adam: Served: 10/23/2021; Returned: 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-07451: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company aso Rockford Willett: (47.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company aso Rockford Willett; Total Financial Assessment: 47.50; Total Payments and Credits: 47.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 47.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D. Warner