Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/27/2021 at 08:28:49 (UTC).

Stasio & Stasio, P.C. vs Roy Ryan Riojas

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Stasio Stasio, P C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Roy Ryan Riojas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********85-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasio & Stasio, P.C.

303 Main St., Ste. 302

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant

Riojas, Roy Ryan

Crowley, TX 76036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 8: (Roy Ryan Riojas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 7: Emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Rule 106 Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Affadavit & Civil Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-168609: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 01/15; Riojas, Roy Ryan: Served: 04/10/2021; Returned: 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: on Sworn Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stasio & Stasio, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR