Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/11/2021 at 12:45:48 (UTC).

Stasio & Stasio, P.C. vs. Roy Ryan Riojas

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Stasio Stasio, P C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Roy Ryan Riojas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4662

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasio & Stasio, P.C.

303 Main St., Ste. 302

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant

Riojas, Roy Ryan

Crowley, TX 76036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: Motion to Dismiss/ EFILED/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: INQ. IF ANSWER HAD BEEN FILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On: //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service-Citation//EFILED//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEmailed: TO PPS/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: APPROVE BOTH METHODS/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit OF RESIDENCY VERIFICATION//EFILED//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: Motion Filed//EFILED//DE- 1ST REQUEST/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Attorney Contacted Court: REP. ASKED TO TALK TO SOMEONE AS TO WHY MTN FOR ALT SERVICE WAS DENIED VIA EFILE// CLERK EXPLND PER OUR JUDGE (WILL ONLY APPROVE MTN FOR ALT SERVICE IF RESIDENCY WAS ESTABLISHED BY HUMAN CONTACT)// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketE-File Filing Rejected: REJECTED-**DENIED REQUEST FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE**The "Request for Alternative Service" for the above and mentioned case needs further investigation. Additional information is needed to assist the Court in determining whether the address provided is the usual place of business or usual place of abode or the place where the defendant can be found. If you have any questions regarding this matter, please call 817-884-1395//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEmailed: CITN FOR PPS//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL CITN FOR PPS//JA; Riojas, Roy Ryan: Served: 12/22/2020; Returned: 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-05610: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed: Affidavit/STATUS PROOF//EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFF OF ACCOUNT/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition//EFILED//EMAIL TO: SHARLYN.BACHMAN@STASIOLAWFIRM.COM //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stasio & Stasio, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR