Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/09/2021 at 11:38:51 (UTC).

Stasio & Stasio, P.C. vs. Michael Lockard,Sharissa Lockard

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Stasio Stasio, P C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael Lockard,Sharissa Lockard. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4199

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasio & Stasio, P.C.

303 Main St., Ste. 302

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendants

Lockard, Sharissa

Boyd, TX 76023

Lockard, Michael

Boyd, TX 76023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketLetter Issued: POST JM/APPEAL INFORMATION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: TO PLTF/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-02024: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $972.42; Awarded To: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Awarded Against: Michael Lockard, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested: Abstract of Judgment ($5.00)/ EFILE/ MAIL TO PLTF ATTY/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketComments: PLTF ATTY APPEARED/ DEF JM ENTERED//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Prove Up Hearing: MAILED TO PLTF/SET FOR 3.13.2020 @ 9AM//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCITATION: SHARISSA/KAC; Lockard, Sharissa: Served: 01/14/2020; Returned: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCITATION: MICHAEL/KAC; Lockard, Michael: Served: 01/14/2020; Returned: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMailed: CIT AND PET FOR BOTH DEFN SENT TO PLTF FOR SERVICE/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-00039: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Total Financial Assessment: 51.00; Total Payments and Credits: 51.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed: FOR SHARISSA LOCKARD/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed: FOR MICHAEL LOCKARD/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit/EFILE/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition/MAIL TO PLTF FOR SERVICE//EFILED/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stasio & Stasio, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR