Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/09/2021 at 23:43:07 (UTC).

Stasio & Stasio, P.C. vs. Jessica Weaver

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Stasio Stasio, P C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jessica Weaver. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4289

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasio & Stasio, P.C.

303 Main St., Ste. 302

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant

Weaver, Jessica

Burleson, TX 76028

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-04517: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: TO PLTF ATTY//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested: Abstract of Judgment ($5.00)/ EFILED/ MAIL TO PLTF ATTY/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEmailed: JM TO PLTF/ MAILED TO DEFN//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; Judgment of $7,151.83; Awarded To: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Awarded Against: Jessica Weaver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComments: PLTF APPEARED VIA ZOOM/ DEFN DID NOT/ DEFAULT JM ENTERED/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Prove Up Hearing: VIA ZOOM/ MAIL TO PLTF/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketEmailed: ZOOM LINK TO PLTF//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service-Citation//EFILE// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY OFFICE/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCITATION: APG; Weaver, Jessica: Served: 03/27/2020; Returned: 03/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-01371: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Total Financial Assessment: 51.00; Total Payments and Credits: 51.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed: Affidavit-MILITARY STATUS PROOF/ EFILE/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit/EFILE/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition/ EFILE/EMAIL CITN TO sharlyn.bachman@stasiolawfirm.com / APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stasio & Stasio, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR