Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/12/2021 at 11:27:10 (UTC).

Stasio & Stasio, P.C. vs. Corey Gann

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Stasio Stasio, P C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Corey Gann. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4636

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasio & Stasio, P.C.

303 Main St., Ste. 302

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant

Gann, Corey

Decatur, TX 76234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: TO PLTF ATTY//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-00306: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested: Abstract of Judgment ($5.00)/ EFILE/ MAIL TO PLTF ATTY/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $4,500.11; Awarded To: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Awarded Against: Corey Gann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMailed: COPIES TO ALL PARTIES//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComments: PLTF APPEARED VIA ZOOM/DEFN FAILED TO APPEAR/DFLT JM//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEmailed: ZOOM LINK TO PLTF/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Prove Up Hearing: SET FOR 1/8/2021-MAILED TO PLTF/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketE-File Filing Rejected: AFFID OF SERVICE SERVED BY PPS// AFFID WAS NOT NOTARIZED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketE-File Filing Rejected: REQUEST FOR ALT SERVICE/ AFFIDAVIT STATES THAT RESIDENT AT ADDRESS LISTED, STATED THAT DEFN DOES NOT LIVE THERE//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketEmailed: CITN FOR PPS//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL CITN FOR PPS//JA; Gann, Corey: Served: 11/19/2020; Returned: 11/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-05214: Stasio & Stasio, P.C.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stasio & Stasio, P.C.; Total Financial Assessment: 51.00; Total Payments and Credits: 51.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed: Affidavit/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition/EFILED//EMAIL TO: SHARLYN.BACHMAN@STASIOLAWFIRM.COM //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stasio & Stasio, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR