This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/30/2019 at 07:31:21 (UTC).

SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS vs. SHADEIDRE THOMAS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHADEIDRE THOMAS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5138

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS

1801 W Arkansas Lane

Arlington, TX 76013

Defendant

THOMAS, SHADEIDRE

Arlington, TX 76013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $618.00; Awarded To: SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: SHADEIDRE THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Vacate Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • EVICTION: THOMAS, SHADEIDRE: Served: 12/09/2019; Returned: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06144: SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff SPRINGFIELD CROSSING APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.