This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 04:57:39 (UTC).

SPRING HILL APARTMENTS vs. TERRY GRAVES AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 SPRING HILL APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TERRY GRAVES AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3033

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING HILL APARTMENTS

Defendant

GRAVES, TERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $898.27; Awarded To: SPRING HILL APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: TERRY GRAVES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketRelease of Judgment Filed and Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : AT $1600

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketDuring the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $550

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $898.27 PAST DUE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: 111014 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 110514/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (111914 @ 9:30AM); GRAVES, TERRY: Served: 11/05/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: GRAVES, TERRY: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: GRAVES, TERRY: Returned Unserved 11/04/2014; Returned: 11/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-01852: HAN-MEI HSIAO: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff SPRING HILL APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRING HILL APARTMENTS is a litigant