This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:02:40 (UTC).

Spartan Business Solutions, LLC dba Spartan Capital vs First National Bank of Texas

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Spartan Business Solutions, LLC dba Spartan Capital filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against First National Bank of Texas. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********23-2

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Spartan Business Solutions, LLC

dba Spartan Capital

Defendants

First National Bank of Texas

507 N Gray

Killeen, TX 76541

b/s registered agent, James W. Meredith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ivan Escobar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 9: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 10: as to First National Bank of Texas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed Non-suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 7: Without Prejudice as to First National Bank of Texas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 8: Duplicate Return-Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: (First National Bank of Texas) Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield & Stout; First National Bank of Texas: Served: 05/17/2022; Returned: 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181903: Spartan Business Solutions, LLC: (236.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Spartan Business Solutions, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 373.00; Total Payments and Credits: 373.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 373.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: Affidavit for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spartan Business Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESCOBAR, IVAN