This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 09:13:38 (UTC).

Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT&T Texas vs Cheldan Homes, LP and Lake Hollow Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 Southwestern Bell Telephone Company d/b/a AT T Texas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cheldan Homes, LP and Lake Hollow Corp. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********49-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southwestern Bell Telephone Company

Defendants

Lake Hollow Corp.

405 W. Loop 820 South, Suite 100

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Cheldan Homes, L.P.

6861 Corporation Pkwy Ste B

Fort Worth, TX 76126

b/s its Registered Agent: Gary W. Havener

405 W. Loop 820 South, Suite 100

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Attn: B/S Serving Registered Agent:: Allen R Goss, Jr.

Fort Worth, TX 76126

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ray L. Vela

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL H DANIELS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court Doc ID#17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Vacation Letter Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Defendant's Pro Se Answer Copy Pltf Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Defendant's First Amended Original Answer Doc ID#14: Pertaining to Cheldan Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Notice of Change of Address Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Notice of Filing Affidavit Doc ID#12: of Cost and Necessity of Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Vacation Letter Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#10: Cheldan Homes, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Citation: mailed to Aty; Cheldan Homes, L.P.: Served: 04/25/2016; Returned: 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-87717: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-86439: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company: (259.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Southwestern Bell Telephone Company; Total Financial Assessment: 275.00; Total Payments and Credits: 275.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 259.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-103317: Cheldan Homes, L.P.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-101668: Cheldan Homes, L.P.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-96730: Cheldan Homes, L.P.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Financial Information: Defendant Cheldan Homes, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 6.00; Total Payments and Credits: 6.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheldan Homes, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Southwestern Bell Telephone Company is a litigant