This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:09:45 (UTC).

Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc. vs Simmons Bank

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Simmons Bank. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********76-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc.

Defendants

Simmons Bank

2200 West 7Th Street Suite 212

Fort Worth, TX 76107

b/s registered agent, Mark A. Crawford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew D. Giadrosich

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTINA A. TILLETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 9: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJudgment Index # 8: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed Judgment of garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Answer Index # 7: Original Answer to Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5: to Judgment Debtors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181055: Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc.: (236.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 373.00; Total Payments and Credits: 373.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 373.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield & Stout; Simmons Bank: Served: 04/08/2022; Returned: 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: Affidavit for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southland Property Tax Consultants, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D. Giadrosich