Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/07/2019 at 13:35:55 (UTC).

SOLAR SUPPLY, INC. vs. BRANDON STANLEY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 SOLAR SUPPLY, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRANDON STANLEY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Wright, Jacquelyn and Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9510

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Wright, Jacquelyn

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Attn: NICKOLAS WILLIAMS

Cleburne, TX 76031

SOLAR SUPPLY, INC.

1548 East Henderson Street

Cleburne, TX 76031

Defendant

STANLEY, BRANDON

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

P HOWARD BAILEY, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Copies/Letter mld to: copy of order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Order of Agreed Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Motion for Agreed Dismissal Filed: via e-mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerWright, Jacquelyn) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • CANCELED: Hearing; (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerWright, Jacquelyn) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Letter Issued: pre-trial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Answer Filed: with notice of appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • CITATION: C01; STANLEY, BRANDON: Served: 10/01/2018; Returned: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Comments: copy of inv's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): w/military affid, SCRA report, LKA & copy of credit app

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2018-5870: SOLAR SUPPLY, INC.: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff SOLAR SUPPLY, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solar Supply Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer P HOWARD BAILEY, JR