Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/27/2021 at 08:17:49 (UTC).

SM Financial Services Corporation vs GECU

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 SM Financial Services Corporation filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GECU. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********72-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SM Financial Services Corporation

Defendants

GECU

1225 Airway Blvd

El Paso, TX 79925

b/s its Registered Agent, Crystal Long

El Paso, TX 79925

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John T. Easter

Defendant Attorney

Robert A. Woodcock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171037: SM Financial Services Corporation: (234.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff SM Financial Services Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 234.00; Total Payments and Credits: 234.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 234.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield/Stout - picked up 3/31/2021; GECU: Returned Unserved 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SM Financial Services Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T. Easter