This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 20:37:25 (UTC).

SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC vs. TINA HICKMAN AND ROMAN HICKMAN AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TINA HICKMAN AND ROMAN HICKMAN AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ritchie, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7827

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ritchie, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC

Po Box 116782

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendants

HICKMAN, ROMAN

Crowley, TX 76036

HICKMAN, TINA

Crowley, TX 76036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2016
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Ritchie, Gary) ; Judgment of $1,780.00; Awarded To: SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC; Awarded Against: TINA HICKMAN, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: HICKMAN, ROMAN: Served: 06/07/2016; Returned: 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Each Defn is Responsible on Judgment for: 890 EACH DEF PLUS 1/2 CC EACH DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Default Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ritchie, Gary) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • CITATION: HICKMAN, TINA: Served: 05/11/2016; Returned: 05/12/2016; HICKMAN, ROMAN: Served: 05/11/2016; Returned: 05/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP6-2016-03761: SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP6-2016-03238: SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC: (191.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff SKYBRIDGE PROPERTIES LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 346.00; Total Payments and Credits: 346.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 191.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skybridge Properties is a litigant