Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/27/2017 at 03:30:29 (UTC).

SHAWN MARKS vs. HLK AUTOGROUP INC MEADOR DODGE CJR AND LAUREN HUNTER

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 SHAWN MARKS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HLK AUTOGROUP INC MEADOR DODGE CJR AND LAUREN HUNTER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9172

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARKS, SHAWN

Waxahachie, TX 75167

Defendants

HLK AUTOGROUP INC MEADOR DODGE CJR

9501 South Freeway

Fort Worth, TX 76140

HUNTER, LAUREN

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: copy of same mailed to both parties..KJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Comments: original citation returned on 08-18-2017 and executed on 08-14-2017 by C08..KJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Answer Due On: ..KJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Comments: after further reviewing the file and dismissal form, dismissal of the entire original case with Defendant HLK AutoGroup, Inc. Meador Dodge CJR is needed; Plaintiff should refile a new case against Defendant Lauren Hunter and pay a new filing fee, per Judge Woodard..KJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Comments: constable's service fee waived, per Sgt. Gardner..KJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • CITATION: HUNTER, LAUREN: Served: 08/14/2017; Returned: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: Defn (HLK AUTOGROUP INC MEADOR DODGE CJR) **ONLY kn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Amended Petition Filed: Updated Defn's name. kn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • CITATION: HLK AUTOGROUP INC MEADOR DODGE CJR: Returned Unserved 08/10/2017; Returned: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2017-02840: MARKS, SHAWN: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MARKS, SHAWN; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less