This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/23/2023 at 14:43:47 (UTC).

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC vs. Orel Valdespino Fernandez

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 SFR INVESTMENTS filed an Other lawsuit against BORROWER 1, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1532

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC

Po Box 815369

Dallas, TX 75381

C/O Jack O Boyle & Associates PLLC

Defendant

Fernandez, Orel Valdespino

Forest Hill, TX 76140

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher S Ferguson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEVICTION: Fernandez, Orel Valdespino: Served: 01/05/2023; Returned: 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP8-2023-00010: SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff SFR INVESTMENTS V BORROWER 1, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 137.00; Total Payments and Credits: 137.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION FOR FORCIBLE DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less