This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/12/2021 at 21:43:25 (UTC).

Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Capital Bank (Zales Outlet) vs. DONALD G PEACOCK

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Capital Bank Zales Outlet filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONALD G PEACOCK. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6438

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Capital Bank (Zales Outlet)

Defendant

PEACOCK, DONALD G

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE C SCHERER

Defendant Attorney

Jon C. (Kit) Gallini

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProposed Order: Order granting for non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Notice of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMotion Filed: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed; 949 8824 7944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled: 949 8824 7944 - EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAttorney Filed Notice of Vacation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMailed: NJT TO PLTF'S ATTY AND DEFN'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer//BY ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSanders, Kenneth D) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProposed Order: 5581100 Order//EFILED.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: 5581100 Sub Serve Affidavit//EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiletx@ezmessenger.com .HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCITATION: PEACOCK, DONALD G: Served: 08/26/2020; Returned: 08/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: CITATION + PETITION EMAILED TO ABOVE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2020-01739: Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Capital Bank (Zales Outlet): (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Second Round Sub, LLC assignee of Comenity Capital Bank (Zales Outlet); Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: 5581100 Peacock Petition//EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiletx@ezmessenger.com .HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George C. Scherer