This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 06:26:45 (UTC).

SANTA BARBARA GARDENS vs. MARQUIS JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 SANTA BARBARA GARDENS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARQUIS JONES AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4253

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTA BARBARA GARDENS

Defendant

JONES, MARQUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $895.13; Awarded To: SANTA BARBARA GARDENS; Awarded Against: MARQUIS JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: OF $895.13 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment: 12/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketComments: CITATION RETN/EXECUTED VIA R510.4C=CRT DTE 01/11/2016@8:30AM..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: JONES, MARQUIS: Served: 12/31/2015; Returned: 12/31/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: ..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: JONES, MARQUIS: Returned Unserved 12/30/2015; Returned: 12/30/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed: apt added - btw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff on this Case: C08 UNABLE TO SERVE NO APT #, LEFT V/M..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: JONES, MARQUIS: Returned Unserved 12/11/2015; Returned: 12/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04588: SANTA BARBARA GARDENS: (75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04374: SANTA BARBARA GARDENS: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff SANTA BARBARA GARDENS; Total Financial Assessment: 191.00; Total Payments and Credits: 191.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less