Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:02:00 (UTC).

Sanmar vs Casa Rojo Promotions, LLC, Travis Barr

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Sanmar filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Casa Rojo Promotions, LLC, Travis Barr. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanmar

Defendants

Barr, Travis

Dallas, TX 75229

Casa Rojo Promotions, LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Roth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Citation: mailed citn to aty; Casa Rojo Promotions, LLC: Served: 03/10/2017; Returned: 03/16/2017; Barr, Travis: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119156: Sanmar: (257.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Sanmar; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 257.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANMAR CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Roth