This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 12:14:09 (UTC).

Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC vs JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********80-1

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC

a domestic limited liability company

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

1999 Bryan Street Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

a foreign financial institution

b/s Registered Agent, CT Corporation System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Lee Turbyfill, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187674: Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRequest: for Copy of Dismissal Order/Emailed to the email on request/11/23/22 CR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 8: Electronically/Emailed served to Party's attorney/and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order Dismissal Without Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice Index # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Index # 6: Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 5: - Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Writ of Garnishment (Duplicate)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Writ of Garnishment on JPMorgan Chase Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-186210: Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC: (236.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Sameday Auto Finanace, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 375.00; Total Payments and Credits: 375.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 373.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney 10/3/2022; JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association: Served: 10/26/2022; Returned: 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Post-Judgment Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sameday Auto Finance, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where a Foreign Financial Institution is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant