Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:04:47 (UTC).

Safilo USA, Inc. vs Troupe Eyecare, LLC d/b/a Troupe Eyecare, PLLC and Amanda Troupe a/k/a Amanda Marie Troupe a/k/a Amanda Gardner Troupe a/k/a Dr. Amanda Troupe a/k/a Amanda Trope f/k/a Amanda Marie Gardner,

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 Safilo USA, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Troupe Eyecare, LLC d/b/a Troupe Eyecare, PLLC and Amanda Troupe a/k/a Amanda Marie Troupe a/k/a Amanda Gardner Troupe a/k/a Dr Amanda Troupe a/k/a Amanda Trope f/k/a Amanda Marie Gardner. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********30-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safilo USA, Inc.

108 Front Street

Dekalb, TX 75559

Defendants

d/b/a Troupe Eyecare, PLLC

Corporation Agents, INC

4040 Vernon Way

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Troupe Eyecare, LLC

9900 Spectrum Dr.

Austin, TX 78717

Troupe, Amanda

Fort Worth, TX 76244

a/k/a Amanda Marie Troupe a/k/a Amanda Gardner Troupe a/k/a Dr. Amanda Troupe a/k/a Amanda Trope f/k/a Amanda Marie Gardner

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID# 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 6: Re: Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 5: of Citation to Troupe Eyecare LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Citation: citns mld to atty; Troupe Eyecare, LLC: Served: 12/28/2016; Returned: 12/30/2016; Troupe, Amanda: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Letter Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117324: Safilo USA, Inc.: (257.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Safilo USA, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 257.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest