This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/13/2023 at 14:04:50 (UTC).

Sabrina De Santi vs. Experian Information Solutions, INC and Barclays Bank Delaware

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Sabrina De Santi filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, INC and Barclays Bank Delaware. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3417

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De Santi, Sabrina

Defendants

Barclays Bank Delaware

1209 Orange St

Wilmington, DE 19801

CORPORATION TRUST CENTER

Experian Information Solutions, INC

1999 Bryan St, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 78701

CT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip Wesley Pool

Defendant Attorneys

Morgan Jae Kleoppel

Kayla Betty Evans

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Appearance of Kayla Evans

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketComments: P/T SETTING NOTICE EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: One Party Non-Suited Before Trial; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Non-Suit of 1 Defendant Only: W/PREJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice: Notice and Order of Nonsuit with Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Rule 91a Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: BY EMAIL - KAYLA EVANS W/JONES DAY REQUESTED TO SPEAK TO CLERK REGARDING THIS CASE - I LEFT V/M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice: Citation with Affidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO ATTORNEYS@JAFFER.LAW; Experian Information Solutions, INC: Served: 11/04/2022; Returned: 11/09/2022; Barclays Bank Delaware: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2022-09093: De Santi, Sabrina: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff De Santi, Sabrina; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less