Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 02:35:09 (UTC).

S & H DISTRIBUTING vs. SAMINA AMEEN AND MASA DESIGN-BUILD, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 S H DISTRIBUTING filed an Other lawsuit against SAMINA AMEEN AND MASA DESIGN-BUILD, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Bierman-Davis, Linda and Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9633

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Bierman-Davis, Linda

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S & H DISTRIBUTING

Defendants

AMEEN, SAMINA

Arlington, TX 76010

MASA DESIGN-BUILD, LLC

2628 Laramie St

Irving, TX 75062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEORGE A MALLERS

George A. Mallers

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID J SHUSTER

DAVID R GIBSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2013
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • Dispositions: One Party Non-Suited at Trial; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • Comments: FILE PERFECTED AND SENT TO COUNTY COURT AT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • Appeal Bond Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • Non-Jury Trial: (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerBierman-Davis, Linda) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerBierman-Davis, Linda) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: CALLED AND ADVISED ELIZABETH W/DAVID SHUSTER OFFICE. CALLED AND LEFT VOICEMAIL FOR DAVID GIBSON & GEORGE MALLERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • Motion For Continuance Filed: RCVD FROM DEFN ATTY DAVID SHUSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (3:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerBierman-Davis, Linda) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Motion For Continuance Filed: JUDGE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2013
  • Answer Filed: SENT COPY TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • CITATION: AMEEN, SAMINA: Served: 01/17/2013; Returned: 01/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2013-04793: JASON MATHIS, ATTY: (20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • Transaction Assessment: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2013-00196: COWLES & THOMPSON: (106.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Transaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff S & H DISTRIBUTING; Total Financial Assessment: 126.00; Total Payments and Credits: 126.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Gibson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID J SHUSTER