Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/12/2021 at 15:33:57 (UTC).

Ross Transports LLC vs. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Ross Transports LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fiat Chrysler Automobiles. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4681

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ross Transports LLC

6728 Park Vista Blvd 404

Watauga, TX 76137

Defendant

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles

1000 Chrysler Drive

Auburn Hills, MI 48326

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : PLTF TO TAKE ACTION, IF NOT SET FOR DWOP/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: PLTF APPEARED VIA ZOOM/ PER JUDGE GRANT 45 DAYS FOR PLTF TO AMEND PETN TO INCLUDE REG AGENT/ IF NO ACTION TAKEN THEN SET FOR DWOP/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDWOP Hearing: (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEmailed: ZOOM LINK TO PLTF ATTY// DWOP SET FOR 3/12/21 AT 1PM// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: DWOPS SET FOR 3/12/2021 AT 1PM MLD/EMLD TO PLTF'S ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only; PLTF TO PROVIDE REGISTERED AGENT FOR SERVICE//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff on this Case: TO REQUEST REGISTERED AGENT FOR SERVICE/ PLTF IS CURRENTLY IN THE HOSPITAL, BUT WILL ATTEMPT TO FIND THE PROPER INFORMATION/ CLERK INFORMED THE PLTF THAT PER CT MGR, WE WILL ALLOW 2 WEEKS FOR THIS INFORMATION TO BE SIUBMITTED/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-05900: Ross Transports LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Ross Transports LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Guide and File - Petition EFILED/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant