This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/03/2023 at 10:09:25 (UTC).

RONNIE L. HAYNES vs. AT&T WIRELESS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 RONNIE L HAYNES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AT T WIRELESS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0565

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYNES, RONNIE L.

Defendant

AT&T WIRELESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Patrick Chastain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial: LETTER MAILED TO PLTF AND DEFN....//ES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: GENERAL DENIAL. CERT OF SERVICE. TO BE SET FOR TRIAL. ATTY ADDED.AMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Prove Up Hearing: SET FOR 9/26/23 AT 10 AM LETTERS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. AMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/Inactive Letter Sent; (7:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED CASE TO BE SET FOR PROVE UP HEARING.AMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: BY CO 1 SERVED TO CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS THROUGH THEIR REGISTERED AGENT AT 1999 BRYAN ST SUITE 900 DALLAS TX 75201/AMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCITATION: AT&T WIRELESS: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: alias citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComments: contacted Dallas County Constable Tracey Gulley's office of Pct. 1 @ 972-228-0006 regarding service on Defn AT&T Wireless/spoke w/clerk & no information appeared in their system

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 46.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCITATION: AT&T WIRELESS: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: TO DALLAS CONSTABLE * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff HAYNES, RONNIE L.; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less