This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:10:59 (UTC).

ROBERT ALLEN AND CYNTHIA ALLEN vs. KRISTINE LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 ROBERT ALLEN AND CYNTHIA ALLEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KRISTINE LOPEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2227

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT ALLEN AND CYNTHIA ALLEN

6603 Saddle Ridge Road

Arlington, TX 76016

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

LOPEZ, KRISTINE

Arlington, TX 76010

Counter Defendants

ALLEN, CYNTHIA

ALLEN, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jason D Tomlin

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Dwain Downing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComments: EMAILED SETTING NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMotion For Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketComments: EMAILED SETTING NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComments: AT PRE-TRIAL - PARTIES AGREED TO SET FOR TRAIL 1 HOUR BENCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: ROBERT AND CYNTHIA ALLEN'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO KRISTINE LOPEZ'S COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCounter Claim Petition Filed: Counter Claim/Cross Action/Interpleader/Intervention/Third Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-02299: ROBERT ALLEN AND CYNTHIA ALLEN: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ROBERT ALLEN AND CYNTHIA ALLEN; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: C02; LOPEZ, KRISTINE: Served: 05/10/2021; Returned: 05/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D Tomlin