This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/23/2022 at 13:31:44 (UTC).

RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES vs. RICHEDDA RICHARD

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RICHEDDA RICHARD. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4087

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES

1904 Thousand Oak Dr

Burleson, TX 76028

Defendant

RICHARD, RICHEDDA

Ft Worth, TX 76116

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Eviction Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMotion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 11/30/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-6007: RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION: RICHARD, RICHEDDA: Served: 11/30/2022; Returned: 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff: LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Vacate Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: CO6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): TENANT ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES is a litigant