This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/27/2023 at 16:38:42 (UTC).

RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES vs. CURTIS TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CURTIS TAYLOR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4083

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES

1904 Thousand Oak Dr

Burleson, TX 76028

Defendant

TAYLOR, CURTIS

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $1,836.00; Awarded To: RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES; Awarded Against: CURTIS TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: CURTISTAYLOR621@GMAIL.COM | 817-262-7000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: LISAW@CLASSAMGMT.COM | 817-258-1371

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXC ALT SERV 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-6003: RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES: (129.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION: TAYLOR, CURTIS: Served: 12/01/2022; Returned: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff: LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Vacate Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: CO6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): TENANT ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDGMAR TOWNHOMES is a litigant